Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Exemption from State Procurement Laws Concerning Minority Business Enterprises and Prevailing Wage Rates
Sponsored by
Senator Brinkley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting Frederick County, as to a specified contract, from the provisions of the State procurement law concerning minority business enterprises; exempting Frederick County, under specified circumstances, from the provisions of the State procurement law concerning prevailing wage rates; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 10:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 10:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/14/2013 3/15/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-301.1, 14-302, 17-201, 17-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM