Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Penalties and Liquidated Damages
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a contractor under a public work contract is liable to the public body for specified damages; increasing the amount of liquidated damages from $20 to $250 for each specified laborer or other specified employee for each day for which the contractor knowingly pays less than the specified prevailing wage rate; requiring contractors and subcontractors to make restitution to employees who have been paid less than the amount to which they were entitled for the work performed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0988
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507878/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507878/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {953228/1 Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {863720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {507878/1 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Serafini) Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {507878/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {953228/1 Rejected (15-31) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {863720/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 62
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM