Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Collaborative Care Pilot Program in the Maryland Department of Health to implement a Collaborative Care Model in primary care settings to provide health care services to recipients enrolled in HealthChoice; requiring the Department to select up to three sites for the Pilot Program; requiring the Department to collaborate with stakeholders on the development, implementation, and outcome monitoring of the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget $550,000 for certain fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197379/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {136689/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {197379/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {136689/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM