Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain county or municipality, after giving 60 days written notice to the electric company and the Public Service Commission, to convert its street lighting service to a certain alternative-energy-only tariff, submit a request to acquire certain street lighting equipment from the electric company, and enter into an agreement to purchase electricity for a certain use from any available electricity supplier under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1034
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
Text - First - County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 5:10 PM