Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsored by
Senators McFadden and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Community Development Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Department to perform specified duties; establishing the Community Development Board in the Department; requiring the Board to perform specified duties; establishing the Community Development Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Department to administer the Fund; providing for the imposition of the community development transfer tax under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-509 )
(   13-601 through 13-608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM