Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Prevention of HIV and Viral Hepatitis
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excepting drug paraphernalia that has been provided to or obtained by the user or possessor as a means of preventing the spread of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) or viral hepatitis from certain prohibitions against using, possessing, selling, delivering, manufacturing, or possessing with intent to deliver or sell drug paraphernalia.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0828
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Prevention of HIV and Viral Hepatitis
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM