Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a hearing of charges filed by specified health occupations boards from being stayed or challenged by specified procedural defects; prohibiting an order of specified health occupations boards from being stayed pending judicial review; altering the circumstances under which an order of specified health occupations boards may not be stayed; repealing obsolete provisions of law regarding the stay of orders of specified health occupations boards; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1290
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184534/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184534/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {184534/1 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {184534/1 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 55A
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-316, 10-317, 11-315, 11-317, 11-318, 13-317, 13-318, 16-313, 16-315, 17-511, 19-312, 19-313, 1A-310, 1A-311, 20-314, 20-315, 2-315, 2-316, 3-315, 3-316, 4-318, 4-319, 5-312, 5-313, 7-319, 7-320, 9-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM