Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Process Servers - Licensing
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring any individual who provides private process service to be licensed by the Secretary of State Police; providing for the terms and renewals of the licenses, qualifications for and duties of licensees, and required records of a licensee; establishing administrative, financial, and surety bond requirements for a licensed private process server; providing for the denial, suspension, or revocation of private process server licenses and the reprimand of or assessment of a fine on licensees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2014 Text - First - Private Process Servers - Licensing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13.5-101 through 13.5-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM