Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions on brewing company off-site permits, distillery off-site permits, and winery off-site permits; establishing a manufacturer's off-site permit with certain privileges; authorizing the Comptroller to issue a permit to the holder of certain manufacturer's licenses; authorizing a permit holder to sell and provide products at events; requiring an employee trained in alcohol awareness to be present at events; authorizing a certain license holder to sell a certain volume of beer at a permitted event; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844432/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {844432/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Economic Matters 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:53 AM