Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Historical Trust, on or before July 1, 2021, to extinguish or terminate a certain easement the Trust holds in the parcel of land known as the Warfield Complex located in Carroll County; and requiring the Trust to complete certain necessary recordings and filings to complete the extinguishment or termination of the easement.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1132
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:00 AM
Click to return on the top page