Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voting - Notice of Election by Specimen Ballot
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date by which a local board of elections must provide voters notice of an election by specimen ballot.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 50
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105, 8-102, 9-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM