Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "expanded polystyrene food service product" to exclude certain egg cartons shipped into the State for packaging or cartons of eggs that have been packaged within the State for sale within the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1442
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {894132/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 49
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Text - Chapter - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2201, 9-2203 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:23 PM