Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Benson, Conway, Currie, Garagiola, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, and Stone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the matters of negotiation that may be included in collective bargaining between an employee organization and specified system institutions, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, or Baltimore City Community College; requiring employees of specified institutions of higher education to furnish written proof to the President of the institution or the President's designee regarding specified payments; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0863
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787978/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787978/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-45)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {787978/1 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {787978/1 Report Adopted 46A
Senate 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Appropriations 50
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (94-45) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM