Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the formula used to apportion income to the State for corporations that carry on a trade or business in and out of the State; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM