Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bates, and Hough
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a jury commissioner to provide prospective juror information concerning individuals who are not citizens of the United States to the State Board of Elections within 5 days after receiving the information; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to make specified arrangements to receive the information; requiring the State Administrator to retain a list of individuals whose information has been submitted; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-504 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:44 PM