Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0843


CH0644

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Caterers - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, King, and Miller
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of certain materials, equipment, and supplies to a certain licensed caterer if, under certain circumstances, the materials, equipment, and supplies will be used by the caterer to perform a catering contract that includes the provision of food and beverages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Statewide Caterers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) Withdrawn
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Kagan) Rejected
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Caterers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Statewide Caterers - Exemption
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 38
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Peters) Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted 40
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) Withdrawn 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters) 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Kagan) Rejected 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Caterers - Exemption
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:39 PM