Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to establish a wellness pilot project in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the wellness pilot project to achieve savings through participation in qualified programs by State employees and their dependents; establishing the dates on which the wellness pilot project begins and ends; requiring participation in the wellness pilot project to be voluntary; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM