Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Members of the Armed Forces - Financial Aid
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Montgomery, Norman, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Return to Maryland Program; providing the purpose of the Program is to encourage and assist eligible students who once lived in Maryland to return to the State and attend a constituent institution of the University System of Maryland; providing that eligible students are exempt from paying the nonresident tuition rate at a constituent institution; providing that the Program is limited to 100 students; providing that on or before June 30, 2017, and June 30, 2018, the University System shall submit a specified report; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0018 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584639/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584639/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {584639/1 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {584639/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.9 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM