Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Evaluations
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the State tax credits subject to legislative review and evaluation under the Tax Credit Evaluation Act; repealing a specified requirement that specified tax credits with termination dates be evaluated; providing that specified departments that administer specified tax credits must promptly provide any information requested by the Department of Legislative Services or an evaluation committee; altering specified dates for specified tax credit evaluations, evaluation reports and public hearings; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {289237/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745264/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senators Peters, Currie, and Edwards
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {289237/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {745264/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senators Peters, Currie, and Edwards 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Refuses to Recede 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-303, 1-306 through 1-308, 1-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM