Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Guaranty Fund - Fund Transfer
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Real Estate Commission to transfer up to $500,000 to the Real Estate Guaranty Fund from the State Real Estate Commission Fund if the amount in the Guaranty Fund falls below $300,000 and the Commission is projected to have an operating surplus of at least $500,000 in the current fiscal year.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1656
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Guaranty Fund - Fund Transfer
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Guaranty Fund - Fund Transfer
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Economic Matters 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text - Chapter - State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Guaranty Fund - Fund Transfer
(   17-101, 17-402, 17-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page