Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission)
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the annual interest rate that the Comptroller sets for tax deficiencies and refunds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments {659532/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM