Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to hunt deer under a Deer Management Permit on any Sunday throughout the year, including all deer hunting seasons; altering the application of specified provisions of law governing Deer Management Permits in Charles County and St. Mary's County; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0788
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-410, 10-415 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM