Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0845 - 2020RS
   CH0009 - 2021RS
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Hettleman
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 9 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Maryland Corps Program Fund to include covering expenses incurred to study certain matters and providing funding to match certain gifts or grants; requiring, in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, funds for the Maryland Corps Program to be as provided in the State budget to cover certain additional expenses; and requiring, for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $150,000 to the Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Overridden (30-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (97-37)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 9 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Appropriations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Overridden (30-15)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (97-37)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 9 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
(   24-1108, 24-1109 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page