Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Requiring Public Bodies to Provide Agendas Under the Open Meetings Act
Sponsored by
Senators Kittleman, Brinkley, and Getty
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government to conduct a study on requiring public bodies to provide agendas under the Open Meetings Act; requiring that the study take into consideration specified factors; requiring the Joint Committee to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015; and providing for the termination of the Act as of the end of June 30, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0157
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments {804531/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM