Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estate Tax - Exclusion Amount
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax; repealing a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2016; and altering a specified limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Estate Tax - Exclusion Amount
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM