Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the method by which an individual or a corporation may claim a credit against the State income tax for certain expenses related to certain wineries and vineyards in the State; extending for 3 years a certain termination provision for the credit; applying the Act to all credits certified after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-735 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM