Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Nursing to establish, beginning January 1, 2015, a program through which the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository reports to the Board specified criminal history information for specified applicants; establishing requirements for the Board to place specified licensees and certificate holders on inactive status if specified documentation of a medical condition is submitted to the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0908
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424836/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396982/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {424836/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {396982/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 58
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-303, 8-309, 8-312, 8-313, 8-314, 8-316 through 8-319, 8-322, 8-6A-01, 8-6A-08, 8-6A-10 through 8-6A-12, 8-6A-10.1, 8-6A-17, 8-6B-01, 8-6B-14, 8-6B-15, 8-6B-18, 8-6B-19, 8-6B-22, 8-6B-27, 8-6B-29, 8-707, 8-708, 8-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM