Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law that provide a separate jury proceeding to determine whether a person convicted of first degree murder is sentenced to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole or imprisonment for life; establishing that a court may sentence a person convicted of first degree murder to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole without the requirement of a separate jury sentencing procedure under specified circumstances; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {653821/1 Rejected (21-26)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Benson) {933128/1 Rejected (20-27)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {413827/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {413827/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {653821/1 Rejected (21-26) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Benson) {933128/1 Rejected (20-27) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {413827/1 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 57
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {413827/1 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin) 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201, 2-203, 2-304, 2-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM