Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State or any of its instrumentalities or political subdivisions from acquiring mortgages or deeds of trust by condemnation during the period between June 1, 2014, and May 30, 2016; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to conduct a study to identify and evaluate methods, including the use of eminent domain by local governments, for restoring equity to specified homeowners who have been unable to obtain mortgage loan modifications to enable them to keep their homes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1346
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288872/2
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288872/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {303825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {288872/2 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {288872/2 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted 65
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {303825/1 Adopted 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 66A
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM