Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain modal administrations of the Department of Transportation to adopt a complete streets policy that provides information for the implementation of design features that accommodate and facilitate safe and convenient access and mobility to facilities by all users; specifying the requirements of a complete streets policy and recognizing that facilities differ and user needs should be balanced to ensure community enhancement; providing exceptions to certain requirements under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0744
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {560513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-21)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {560513/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-21) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-112, 5-408.1, 7-309, 8-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM