Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition for purposes of specified provisions of law prohibiting nonjudicial actions to take possession of property; repealing specified provisions of law providing that the establishment of a lien is the remedy for nonpayment of a ground rent on specified residential property; altering the manner of giving specified notice; authorizing the holder of a ground rent in arrears to be reimbursed for specified expenses under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1232
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1095 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/24/2015 Text - First - Real Property - Ground Rents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-108.1, 14-116.1, 14-117, 7-113, 8-107, 8-111.1, 8-111.2, 8-402.2, 8-402.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM