Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to provide a copy of specified application materials for a certificate of public convenience and necessity to each appropriate unit of local government in which the construction of a generating station or of a specified overhead transmission line is proposed to be located; requiring each unit of local government to review the application materials and make a specified determination as to whether the application is consistent with the jurisdiction's comprehensive plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302, 1-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM