Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the membership of the Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. consist of each licensed owner and trainer who is subject to a certain assessment; altering the circumstances under which a jockey is a covered employee under workers' compensation law; altering a certain provision of law to provide that the employer of a jockey who is a covered employee under workers' compensation law is the Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1592
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {437370/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text - Chapter - Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership
(   9-1015, 9-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page