Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsored by
Senators West and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the uses of a certain account in the Bay Restoration Fund to include making certain no- or low-cost loans for the repair or replacement of certain failing on-site sewage disposal systems; limiting a certain loan to a homeowner who resides in a jurisdiction that has developed and implemented a certain septic stewardship plan; for fiscal year 2021, requiring the Governor to appropriate $10,000,000 in the annual State operating or capital budget to the Bay Restoration Fund for certain purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
(   19-1001 through 19-1004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM