Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Montgomery, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators in the Department of Disabilities; establishing that the purpose of the Alliance is to advance the community inclusion of individuals with intellectual disabilities and developmental disabilities through specified programs; establishing specified requirements for the Alliance; establishing a Steering Committee for the Alliance; providing for the funding of the Alliance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527379/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {527379/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-501 through 7-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM