Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Feldman, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain general contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by a subcontractor regardless of whether the subcontractor is in a direct contractual relationship with the general contractor; requiring a subcontractor to indemnify a general contractor for certain wages, damages, interest, penalties, or fees except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763292/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-48)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {763292/1 Adopted 52A
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (85-48) 53
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM