Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Uninsured Motor Vehicle Coverage - Exclusion
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified uninsured motorist coverage does not apply to a specified policy that provides motor vehicle liability insurance for a vehicle that is involved in a collision with an insured motor vehicle under specified circumstances; providing that an insurer may exclude from specified uninsured motorist coverage benefits for a collision that involves a motor vehicle that leaves the scene of the collision except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 27-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM