Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Conway, and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a secretary of a principal department of the Executive Branch of State government from soliciting, accepting, transmitting, or depositing in a campaign account contributions or donations for the benefit of a candidate or political party; prohibiting a secretary from being a candidate for a public elective office while serving as secretary; authorizing the State Board of Elections to impose a civil penalty on specified entities as a result of a violation of this Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-244 )
(   8-201, 8-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM