Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Feldman, Hershey, Klausmeier, and Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a reverse mortgage lender to establish an escrow account for the payment of property taxes and insurance; requiring the escrow account to be established in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring the escrow account to allow for monthly collection and deposit of funds; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM