Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - HIV Testing During Pregnancy
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Ferguson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified health care providers to obtain consent for HIV testing in accordance with specified provisions of law and to test pregnant patients, except under specified circumstances, during the first and third trimesters of pregnancy; repealing specified provisions of law made obsolete by the Act; and providing that specified health care providers may not be subject to specified disciplinary action under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0180
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356987/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {356987/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-338.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM