Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain legislative findings and declarations; establishing the Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund to provide funding for the education of drivers about the security requirements for motor vehicles in the State; establishing in the Uninsured Division a Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured to reduce the number of uninsured vehicles in the State; providing that an individual is eligible to participate in the Program under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {857078/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text - Chapter - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101, 20-301, 20-610 through 20-614 )
(   12-112, 17-104.2, 17-106, 17-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM