Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Oaks, Benson, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of certain proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City; requiring that 49.5% of the proceeds be used for school construction projects, 49.5% of the proceeds are to be used for recreational facilities and 1% of the proceeds is to be paid to the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account; and providing that the proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City to be used for recreational facilities may be used only to supplement and not to supplant existing expenses or obligations.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational Facilities
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM