Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2018 and for each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the budget bill an appropriation to provide specified wraparound services for 300 children or youth with intensive mental health needs who meet specified eligibility criteria.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0579
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/03/2016 3/04/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1501, 10-1502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM