Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a person, whose business or property has been injured or threatened with injury by a violation of specified provisions of law, may maintain an action for damages, an injunction, or both, against any person who has committed the violation, regardless of whether the person maintaining the action dealt directly or indirectly with the person who has committed the violation; altering a specified defense that a defendant may raise in specified actions for damages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {457570/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Economic Matters 52
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM