Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2021, certain invitations to bid and certain requests for proposals to require bidders and offerors to provide certain documentation; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and county departments of corrections to give a preference to certain bidders and offerors based on the number of formerly incarcerated individuals the bidder or offeror employs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1524
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   8-7A-01 through 8-7A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 11:22 AM