Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial Fertilizer
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland individual and corporate income tax for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2026, for the additional expenses to purchase and apply specified qualified commercial fertilizer on an agricultural production; requiring the State Department of Agriculture to calculate the amount of the subtraction allowed; requiring a taxpayer to file a specified certification with the taxpayer's income tax return; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {989730/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {989730/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208, 10-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM