Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Smith, Benson, King, Pinsky, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, for certain purposes, the term "transfer" includes a loan other than a temporary gratuitous exchange of a regulated firearm between two individuals who remain in the same location for the duration of the exchange.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1031
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM