Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the administrative head of a specified institution or a designee of the administrative head or the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide to the mother, father, or legal guardian of a child a specified notice relating to security freezes under specified circumstances; requiring the Consumer Protection Division to prepare a specified notice explaining how to request a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze on a file relating to an individual under 16 years of age at the time of the request; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0661
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM