Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the juvenile court, in a certain case in which jurisdiction is transferred from a court exercising criminal jurisdiction, to issue body attachments for witnesses as provided by a certain Maryland Rule.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judiciary 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {172112/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page