Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Bates, Benson, Currie, Edwards, Ferguson, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Salling, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing a permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas in the State until October 1, 2019, and only under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from engaging in hydraulic fracturing in a local jurisdiction unless the local jurisdiction has submitted to a referendum of the voters of the local jurisdiction a specified question and a majority of the voters have voted in a specified manner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:44 PM